PEPO LA TUMAINI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education by the provision of financial support for costs related to the administration, bursary and maintenance of the Pepo La Tumaini Primary and Senior Schools located in Isiolo, Kenya. To advance education by the provision of periodic financial aid to the Pepo La Tumaini clinic and school in Isiolo, Kenya.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
Governance
- 01 June 2015: Standard registration
- 06 January 2016: Funds received from 1127530 TUMAINI EDUCATION TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Susan Whittle | Chair | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pax Barnabas Nindi | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kashif Ganatra | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sian Mary Newton | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edward Oxley | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kruger | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
CATRIONA JACQUELINE WYKEHAM SPILLER | Trustee | 27 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.25k | £92.44k | £59.84k | £95.55k | £21.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.71k | £82.48k | £109.52k | £24.69k | £55.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
4.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 4.1.1 THE PROVISION OF FUNDING AND SUPPORT TO MAINTAIN PEPO LA TUMAINI NURSERY, PRIMARY SCHOOL AND MEDICAL CENTRE AND ASSOCIATED VOCATIONAL EDUCATION, SOCIAL CARE AND FOSTERING PROGRAMMES AND HOME-BASED HEALTHCARE PROGRAMMES IN ISIOLO, KENYA; AND 4.1.2 THE PROVISION OF FUNDING AND SUPPORT TO OTHER ACCREDITED ORGANISATIONS, SCHOOLS OR REGISTERED CHARITIES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND/OR HEALTH IN KENYA.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 80 Strand
London
WC2R 0DT
- Phone:
- 02072983334
- Email:
- angelaw@pepolatumaini.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window