Financial history CROWLAND COMMUNITY HUB

Charity number: 1163120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.15k £30.39k £18.75k £23.33k £25.41k
Total expenditure £11.37k £36.00k £11.94k £22.86k £20.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.17k £5.17k N/A £5.17k