ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Environmental Defense Fund Europe seeks - the advancement of the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment - the advancement of the education of the public with particular reference to the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment - promotion of sustainable development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£9,302,994
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £9.30m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £4.37k |
Total expenditure:
£9,844,847
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £9.84m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.84m |
People

43 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 3 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
£350k to £400k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
- Belgium
- Germany
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Spain
- Sweden
Governance
- 02 December 2015: Standard registration
- EDF EUROPE/UK, EDF EUROPE, EDF UK, ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND EUROPE/UK, ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND (Working name)
- ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENCE FUND EUROPE/UK (Previous name)
- ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND EUROPE (Previous name)
- ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Ferenbach | Chair | 15 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Sean Cook | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ngwarai Louis Mkanganwi | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Harrison | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Monge | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
LORD BRIAN GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Lance West | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.26m | £3.77m | £4.06m | £5.85m | £9.30m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82m | £3.79m | £4.00m | £5.79m | £9.84m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.26m | £0 | £56.36k | £22.79k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £3.76m | £4.01m | £5.75m | £9.30m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £415 | £1.08k | £0 | £77.52k | £4.37k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £56.36k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.82m | £3.79m | £4.00m | £5.79m | £9.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £23.07k | £31.40k | £79.40k | £45.03k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £97.35k | £300.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £38.12k | £56.67k | £51.10k | £77.53k | £782.09k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £887.10k | £1.18m | £1.41m | £1.43m | £637.60k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £303.43k | £634.88k | £822.86k | £791.09k | £1.24m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JUN 2016 as amended on 07 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE: 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; 3 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BY: (A)THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B)THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Floor
10 Queen Street Place
London
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- 02033105925
- Email:
- compliance@edf.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window