EHE RARE CANCER CHARITY (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The EHE Rare Cancer Charity (UK) has three key objectives. Firstly we provide support to patients diagnosed with epithelioid haemangioendothelioma (EHE), a very rare form of vascular sarcoma. Secondly we are raising funds to support and fund research into EHE. Thirdly, we are working to raise awareness of EHE and to secure greater attention and improved care for people diagnosed with EHE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Australia
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- United States
Governance
- 30 June 2015: CIO registration
- EHERCC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH LEONARD | Chair | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Baker | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Oliver Matthew Thomas Pearce | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEFFERY IAN COLLINS | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATE HOOPER | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.45k | £53.07k | £100.93k | £106.56k | £73.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.75k | £133.12k | £152.78k | £163.72k | £172.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION, TREATMENT, AND CURE OF CANCER INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO EPITHELIOID HEMANGIOENDOTHELIOMA AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF, 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER BY IMPROVING METHODS OF TREATMENT. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF CANCER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Geneva Road
Kingston upon Thames
KT1 2TW
- Phone:
- 02089745643
- Email:
- contactus@ehercc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window