RIPLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall for the benefit of the parish of Ripley and Send Marsh
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 July 2015: CIO registration
- 29 October 2017: Funds received from 305114 RIPLEY VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Brown | Chair | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Grewal | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Powell | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Thomas Cooper | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Gill | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher William Holyoak | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derek Keith Austin | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Haig-Brown | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
VERNON WOOD | Trustee | 24 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.62k | £622.02k | £675.42k | £1.10m | £462.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.93k | £12.01k | £61.15k | £18.87k | £53.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.00k | £619.18k | £600.00k | £426.71k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £560 | £6.91k | £3.52k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £2.25k | £3.03k | £3.36k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £8.02k | £28.26k | £33.01k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £7 | £295 | £11.35k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £611.19k | £1.35k | £1.05m | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £12.01k | £61.15k | £18.87k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Jul 2015 as amended on 12 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF RIPLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF, INCLUDING THE AREA KNOWN AS SENDMARSH ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIPLEY VILLAGE HALL
HIGH STREET
RIPLEY
WOKING
GU23 6AF
- Phone:
- 07748531275
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window