RONNIE SCOTTS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ronnie Scott's Charitable Foundation is a non-profit organization dedicated to the support of jazz education in the United Kingdom, and beyond. To advance such charitable purposes as the trustees see fit from time to time in particular, but not limited to, raising and distributing funds and gifting musical instruments to organisations and individuals that create or develop youth jazz programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 October 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alistair William Mackenzie | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Frederick Henry Heltzel Nash | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Vivien Coyne | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
SALLY GREENE | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.74k | £2.56k | £3.48k | £104.47k | £53.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.53k | £8.50k | £251 | £44.43k | £10.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 APR 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO: (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROMOTION, ENCOURAGEMENT AND SUPPORT OF MUSICAL EDUCATION PROGRAMMES TO ENSURE THAT MUSIC EDUCATION IS ACCESSIBLE TO EVERY CHILD AND YOUNG PERSON ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO ARE UNDER PRIVILEGED. (2) TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO RAISING AND DISTRIBUTING FUNDS (AND PROVIDING LOANS) AND GIFTING MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS TO ORGANISATIONS THAT CREATE OR DEVELOP YOUTH JAZZ PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ronnie Scotts Charitable Foundation
47 Frith Street
LONDON
W1D 4HT
- Phone:
- 02074390747
- Email:
- Ada@ronniescotts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window