Financial history THE BAKED BEAN CHARITY

Charity number: 1163851
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £247.68k £662.66k £512.69k £652.85k £1.62m
Total expenditure £223.82k £512.64k £496.47k £691.70k £1.79m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £25.24k N/A £22.00k
Income from government grants £12.23k £3.24k N/A £24.22k £30.85k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £4.43k £600 £980 £72.23k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £658.23k £512.09k £627.65k £1.55m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £28
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £24.22k £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £512.64k £496.47k £551.72k £1.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £6.56k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £28.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £139.98k £0