THE BAKED BEAN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was formed in 2015 for, ?The promotion of social inclusion for the public benefit among adults with learning disabilities who are socially excluded from society or parts of society as a result of their learning disability by providing them with projects and groups around theatre, drama and the arts to relieve the needs of those people and assist them to integrate into society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£1,621,080
Donations and legacies | £72.23k | |
Charitable activities | £1.55m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £28 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,789,744
Raising funds | £6.56k | |
Charitable activities | £1.78m | |
Other | £0 |
£28 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £22,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £30,850 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.56k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.78m |
People

66 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 October 2015: CIO registration
- 07 June 2022: Funds received from 1172926 CHRISSIE'S DAY OUT
- BBC (Working name)
- THE BAKED BEAN COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marina Russ | Chair | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roy Edwards | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Beard | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hubbert | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £247.68k | £662.66k | £512.69k | £652.85k | £1.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.82k | £512.64k | £496.47k | £691.70k | £1.79m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £25.24k | N/A | £22.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.23k | £3.24k | N/A | £24.22k | £30.85k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £4.43k | £600 | £980 | £72.23k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £658.23k | £512.09k | £627.65k | £1.55m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £28 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £24.22k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £512.64k | £496.47k | £551.72k | £1.78m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £28.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £139.98k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £8.55k | £5.95k | £3.80k | £15.67k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £178.81k | £201.69k | £204.54k | £242.94k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £10.78k | £14.84k | £54.39k | £273.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 April 2025 | 426 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 April 2025 | 426 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 06 OCT 2015 REGISTERED ON 24 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND DISABILITIES, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED OR AT RISK OF EXCLUSION FROM SOCIETY OR PARTS OF SOCIETY. BY PROVIDING THEM WITH TUITION, EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS AND WORKSHOPS SUCH AS THEATRE, DRAMA AND THE ARTS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Wilditch Community Centre
48 Culvert Rd
London
SW11 5BB
- Phone:
- 02089440024
- Email:
- info@bakedbeancharity.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window