Founders Pledge Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the charitable sector by improving the efficiency/effectiveness of methods used to secure charitable resources, in particular by raising awareness in the digital business community. We are also advancing the education of individuals and organisations working in the tech/digital sectors as to the ways in which their business and experience could help to improve charity effectiveness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£111,338,352
Donations and legacies | £110.64m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £241.33k | |
Investments | £448.23k | |
Other | £7.91k |
Total expenditure:
£108,291,142
Raising funds | £94.33k | |
Charitable activities | £108.20m | |
Other | £0 |
£799,739 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £94.33k | |
Charitable expenditure | £108.20m | |
Retained for future use | £3.05m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £94.33k | |
Charitable expenditure | £108.20m | |
Retained for future use | £3.85m |
People

61 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 6 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 9 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 3 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Germany
- United States
Governance
- 15 June 2015: Standard registration
- FFFG (Working name)
- FOUNDERS FOR GOOD LTD (Previous name)
- FOUNDERS FORUM FOR GOOD LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vikrant Bhargava | Chair | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andreas Haug | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erin Marie Platts | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna McKelvey | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Morton | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Hsi Lin Ding | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ian Chapman | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.00m | £19.76m | £41.77m | £53.70m | £111.34m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.29m | £9.84m | £35.64m | £45.94m | £108.29m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.35m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £13.00m | £19.29m | £41.73m | £53.59m | £110.64m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £469.98k | £38.24k | £0 | £241.33k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £109.77k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £856 | £3.37k | £454 | £313 | £448.23k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.91k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.15m | £9.80m | £35.61m | £45.93m | £108.20m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £141.27k | £41.84k | £31.71k | £13.16k | £94.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.70k | £3.42m | £3.40m | £0 | £28.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £3.82m | £6.24m | £31.98m | £41.30m | £101.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £53.29k | £33.77k | £20.14k | £23.16k | £42.70k | |
|
Long-term investments | £149.53k | £193.25k | £0 | £1.25m | £2.52m | |
|
Other assets | £10.75m | £19.89m | £26.24m | £34.22m | £36.32m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £568.71k | £189.95k | £228.90k | £607.06k | £487.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 APR 2016 as amended on 03 Nov 2020 as amended on 16 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
5.1 TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE SECTOR BY PROMOTING AND IMPROVING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF METHODS USED TO SECURE CHARITABLE RESOURCES, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY RAISING AWARENESS AMONG INDIVIDUALS INVOLVED IN THE DIGITAL BUSINESS COMMUNITY; 5.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS WORKING IN TECHNOLOGY, DIGITAL MEDIA AND OTHER DIGITAL INDUSTRIES AS TO THE WAYS IN WHICH THEIR BUSINESS KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERIENCE COULD BE USED TO IMPROVE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 5.2.1 THE PROVISION OF TRAINING; AND 5.2.2 THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES. 5.3 TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Runway East
New City Court
20 St. Thomas Street
LONDON
SE1 9RS
- Phone:
- 02080640186
- Email:
- ops@founderspledge.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window