TEHMINA DURRANI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 23 July 2015: CIO registration
- TDF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MEHR MUSSARAT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AMINA DURRANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TEHMINA DURRANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days | |
Annual return | 19 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 379 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 379 days | |
Annual return | 19 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 745 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 745 days | |
Annual return | 19 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1110 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1110 days | |
Annual return | 19 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1475 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH SUPPORT OF WOMEN WHO HAVE SUFFERED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FROM THE PAKISTANI COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 WAYLAND ROAD
MANCHESTER
M18 7HA
- Phone:
- 07944964243
- Email:
- AMARALYAS@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window