Financial history ROSE HILL JUNIOR YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1161836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £115.95k £208.20k £157.28k £124.83k £147.87k
Total expenditure £113.18k £71.58k £132.75k £154.15k £167.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £11.00k £1.00k £50.00k £85.00k