Financial history GRACE AND TRUTH MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1162869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.50k £1.23k £2.97k £3.22k £3.23k
Total expenditure £1.22k £1.58k £2.97k £385 £3.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A