Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS BIRCHINGTON WITH ST MILDRED ACOL AND ST THOMAS MINNIS BAY
Charity Number: 1163660

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Peter Ham | Chair | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Kathleen Patricia Porteous | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Paul John Albert Seymour | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Mary Whitehead | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy Simon Attride | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Neville Hudson | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Webster | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Janette Porter | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Bernard Taylor | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy Mark Maakestad | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Douglas George Holmes | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Michael John Little | Trustee | 14 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MAUREEN ANN HUDSON | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
GEOFF PEGG | Trustee | 01 April 2010 |
|
|
||||||
LORAINE ANNE BANT | Trustee | 01 April 2010 |
|
|
||||||
SARA GOWER | Trustee | 01 April 2010 |
|
|||||||
DAVE ALKER | Trustee | 01 April 2010 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.