Accounts and annual returns EBOLA ORPHANS OF SIERRA LEONE

Charity number: 1162460
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not submitted