FOUNDATION FOR JEWISH HERITAGE

Charity Number: 1162111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the Foundation for Jewish Heritage are: * to promote for the benefit of the public the conservation, protection and improvement of the built Jewish heritage including synagogues, monuments, cemeteries, communal buildings and sites of religious, historical, architectural, social or cultural significance * to advance the education of the public regarding Jewish heritage

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £265,988
Total expenditure: £332,819

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Austria
  • France
  • Germany
  • Hungary
  • Poland
  • Slovakia
  • Spain
  • Turkey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 June 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Sebag Montefiore Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
Esther Robinson Wild Trustee 11 May 2020
None on record
David Bearman Trustee 10 July 2018
Bishnat
Received: On time
THE ROSEMARIE NATHANSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 6 days late
Daniel Peltz Trustee 20 January 2017
THE NGT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE WARBURG CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 74 days late
THE ANNA FREUD CENTRE
Received: On time
The Wiener Holocaust Library
Received: On time
TUTORING TO THRIVE
Received: On time
THE MUSIC IN SECONDARY SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
STEPHEN GOLDMAN Trustee 02 August 2016
None on record
Sir SIMON SCHAMA CBE Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Lord Daniel Finkelstein Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
THE RIGHT HONOURABLE JIM MURPHY Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Helen Hyde DBE Trustee 01 August 2016
ONE VISION
Received: On time
YAD VASHEM UK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
HOLOCAUST EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
STUART RODEN Trustee 01 August 2016
UP - UNLOCKING POTENTIAL
Received: On time
THE INSTITUTE OF JEWISH STUDIES
Received: On time
RABBI SACKS LEGACY TRUST
Received: On time
THE WARBURG CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 74 days late
RICHARD ZIEGLER Trustee 10 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £266.21k £141.10k £210.44k £315.90k £265.99k
Total expenditure £117.09k £115.71k £98.24k £207.24k £332.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £25.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 24 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 16 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 16 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 24 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 25 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 20 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NEW BURLINGTON HOUSE
1075 FINCHLEY ROAD
LONDON
NW11 0PU
Phone:
07968529609