Financial history NORTH WEST CHARITY SINGERS

Charity number: 1162022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.71k £1.13k £12.55k £22.63k £19.55k
Total expenditure £12.91k £1.55k £12.54k £20.63k £20.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A