Financial history ADVANCED EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1165476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.58k £15.03k £20.18k £16.89k £18.12k
Total expenditure £17.78k £46.33k £16.27k £23.58k £18.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A