Financial history SELBY DISTRICT PETER PAN NURSERY

Charity number: 1162118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £143.04k £123.49k £114.08k £118.96k £143.68k
Total expenditure £84.72k £93.09k £130.04k £125.12k £142.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.12k £29.85k £4.91k £7.34k £1.00k