SELBY DISTRICT PETER PAN NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of pre-school nursery for the benefit of disadvantaged children in the Selby district.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Chapman | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Casey | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Whitehead | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Victoria Alty | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Mary Moore | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.04k | £123.49k | £114.08k | £118.96k | £143.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.72k | £93.09k | £130.04k | £125.12k | £142.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.12k | £29.85k | £4.91k | £7.34k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE WHO ARE SEVERELY HANDICAPPED, DISABLED OR IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Peter Pan Nursery
The Bungalow
North Crescent
Sherburn in Elmet
Leeds
LS25 6DD
- Phone:
- 01977681863
- Email:
- office@peterpannursery.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window