FREE RANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FREE RANGE PRESENTS HIGH-QUALITY AND INNOVATIVE MUSIC, FILM AND POETRY EVENTS WITH A POLICY OF FREE ENTRY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN EAST KENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 28 May 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Wolloshin | Chair | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yoriko Otomo | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver James Carruthers | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillen Knight | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kamila Lobuzinska | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.01k | £16.12k | £18.30k | £32.85k | £34.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.52k | £8.04k | £21.10k | £22.03k | £32.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.49k | £14.78k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 May 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN KENT BY PROVIDING REGULAR FREE-ENTRY EVENTS THAT SHOWCASE LOCAL MUSIC, FILM AND POETRY ALONGSIDE NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL MUSIC, FILM AND POETRY OF THE HIGHEST QUALITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Prospect Place
Canterbury
CT1 3JU
- Phone:
- 07737152775
- Email:
- sam@freerangecanterbury.org
- Website:
-
freerangecanterbury.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window