COVENTRY PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bringing good quality classical choral music to the public. Training the choir and encouraging music students to practice their craft (e.g. conducting, composing). Encouraging future choristers by having a zero membership fee for students. Presenting concerts by the choir including employing high class soloists and musicians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 05 April 1977: Standard registration
- COVENTRY PHILHARMONIC CHOIR (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Simmons | Chair | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Myers | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Weston | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Celia Lewis | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Gelsthorpe | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Ward | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Agata Jakubowska | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Neil Kingdon | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Wieczerzynska | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard White | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jay Durrant | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Cowen | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Chester | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Naya | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henry Whitney | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.15k | £21.98k | £2 | £19.91k | £21.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.47k | £22.44k | £3.47k | £17.77k | £18.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 December 2020 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 December 2020 | 164 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 6 OCTOBER 1975 AS AMENDED 2 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Merryfield Way
COVENTRY
CV2 2NS
- Phone:
- 02476413477
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window