Financial history BRAINWAVE INDEPENDENCE GROUP

Charity Number: 1162939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £94.10k £170.86k £151.69k £125.32k £106.24k
Total expenditure £81.53k £159.06k £148.10k £137.77k £143.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £24.70k £46.99k £3.04k N/A N/A