AMRIT AND AJIT CHARITABLE TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prevention or relief of poverty in developing countries particularly in India and Africa by providing grants to other charities and items and services to individual facing poverty. Funding skill based learning to prevent poverty and providing marriages to support homeless women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Canada
- India
- Pakistan
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 16 February 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BALVINDER SINGH BAHRA | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
SURINDER BAHRA | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.00k | £50.00k | £70.00k | £54.00k | £35.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.34k | £12.88k | £14.89k | £35.50k | £14.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 02 October 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 02 October 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 14 December 2023 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 13 March 2024 | 165 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 08 June 2023 | 251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 08 June 2023 | 251 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/11/2015
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AND IN PARTICULAR IN INDIA AND AFRICA BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 9-13 Crystal Drive
Smethwick
Birmingham
B66 1QG
- Phone:
- 0121 511 1057
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window