PREGNANCY CENTRES NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting pregnancy centres across the UK and encouraging best practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- PCN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Turley | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Fraser | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judy McGibbon | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Bevan | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Thompson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Kimbangi | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
CELIA JOYCE WYATT | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.55k | £53.77k | £81.14k | £92.51k | £96.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.33k | £42.60k | £89.80k | £97.04k | £96.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 1. ADVANCE EDUCATION INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION IN THE SUBJECTS OF SEX, RELATIONSHIPS, PREGNANCY AND THE TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY; 2. PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THE HEALTH OF WOMEN WITH UNPLANNED PREGNANCY OR PREGNANCY LOSS; 3. RELIEVE NEED AND DISTRESS INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION ANY NEED OR DISTRESS CAUSED BY UNPLANNED PREGNANCY OR PREGNANCY LOSS; AND 4. ADVANCE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER FIT IN CONNECTION WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY SEEK TO ADVANCE ITS OBJECTS BY SUPPORTING INDEPENDENT PREGNANCY CENTRES TO ADVANCE ITS OBJECTS. HOWEVER, WHATEVER MEANS THE TRUSTEES ADOPT TO ADVANCE ITS OBJECTS, THE TRUSTEES SHALL TAKE REASONABLE STEPS TO ENSURE THAT THE OBJECTS ARE ADVANCED BY THE CHARITY AND ANY INDEPENDENT PREGNANCY CENTRES IT SUPPORTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH: · THE TEACHINGS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE CHRISTIAN IDENTITY AND ETHOS OF THE CHARITY AND ANY PREGNANCY CENTRE IT SUPPORTS, AS SUCH TEACHINGS, IDENTITY AND ETHOS MAY BE DEFINED AND DESCRIBED BY THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY FROM TIME TO TIME; · ANY BEST PRACTICE OCCUPATIONAL OR PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS APPLICABLE TO ANY ADVICE, COUNSELLING, GUIDANCE OR OTHER SUPPORT PROVIDED BY THE CHARITY OR ANY PREGNANCY CENTRES IT SUPPORTS; AND · THE FUNDAMENTAL CONVICTION THAT ALL ADVICE, COUNSELLING, GUIDANCE OR SUPPORT PROVIDED TO WOMEN, THEIR PARTNERS OR FAMILIES WHO ARE SEEKING THE SUPPORT OF THE CHARITY OR ANY PREGNANCY CENTRES SUPPORTED BY IT SHALL BE 'NON-DIRECTIVE'. THE PROVISION OF NON-DIRECTIVE SUPPORT MEANS THAT NEITHER THE CHARITY NOR THE PREGNANCY CENTRES IT SUPPORTS SHALL OFFER OPINIONS OR VIEWS AS TO WHAT IS A ‘RIGHT’ OR A ‘WRONG’ CHOICE OR COURSE OF ACTION BUT SHALL INSTEAD SEEK TO PROVIDE OBJECTIVE INFORMATION AND GUIDANCE IN A CARING AND COMPASSIONATE WAY TO ENABLE SUCH WOMEN, PARTNERS AND FAMILIES TO MAKE THEIR OWN INFORMED CHOICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pregnancy Centres Network
Bradbury House
Durngate Place
Winchester
Hampshire
SO23 8DX
- Phone:
- 01962 813302
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window