WORK-WISE

Charity number: 1166226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A support centre for those seeking work

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,383
Total expenditure: £9,665

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 March 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WORK-WISE (TAUNTON) (Working name)
  • WORK-WISE PROJECT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sheena Mary Helliar Trustee 25 April 2023
TAUNTON UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
Christine Anne Thorne Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
William Graham Dickinson Trustee 13 April 2021
TAUNTON DEANE AND SOUTH SEDGEMOOR METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
TEMPLE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
KATHRYN TURNER Trustee 13 April 2021
TEMPLE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Christopher Mitchell Trustee 13 April 2021
TEMPLE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev DEBORAH MARY KIRK Trustee 15 November 2018
TEMPLE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
South West Peninsula Methodist District
Received: On time
TAUNTON DEANE AND SOUTH SEDGEMOOR METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.39k £19.17k £8.84k £12.03k £7.38k
Total expenditure £12.57k £10.36k £6.54k £9.57k £9.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
United Reformed Church
Paul Street
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA1 3PF
Phone:
01823 325030