THE BEE FRIENDLY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Installing bee friendly plants on London railway stations; running educational workshops; skill development with African beekeepers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £21,830 from 4 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Madagascar
Governance
- 11 May 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jane Louise Turner | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN VAUGHAN TURNER | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA MARY HALL | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.03k | £118.17k | £207.85k | £205.82k | £184.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.46k | £109.69k | £164.54k | £157.61k | £119.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £3.69k | £17.98k | £21.83k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 May 2015
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1 TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING THE CRAFT OF BEE KEEPING AND PROMOTING THE IMPORTANCE OF BEES AND OTHER POLLINATORS IN THE ENVIRONMENT; AND 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING, INCLUDING BY PROMOTING, FINANCING, ORGANISING, CARRYING ON AND ENCOURAGING RESEARCH INTO BEES AND OTHER POLLINATORS; AND (B) WORKING WITH SCHOOLS AND THEIR PUPILS TO INCREASE KNOWLEDGE ON THE IMPORTANCE OF BEES AND OTHER POLLINATORS IN THE ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND MADAGASCAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 6
Clarion House
4 St. Annes Court
London
W1F 0BA
- Phone:
- 07952960424
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window