ST STEPHEN'S PCC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Stephen's is an Anglican (Church of England) Church in the modern Catholic tradition. We are a friendly congregation drawn mainly from the local community and reflecting the rich diversity of this part of London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 01 May 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Daniel John Burton | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
LANA RUDDOCK | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA ANDERSON | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CORAL PATRICIA MARTIN | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.06k | £145.85k | £165.68k | £205.45k | £117.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.04k | £137.06k | £123.39k | £173.48k | £126.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £640 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Warwick Road
THORNTON HEATH
Surrey
CR7 7NH
- Phone:
- 07582 565032
- Email:
- VICARNTH@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window