Trustees TORPENHOW VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE
Charity number: 1162826

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacques Hankin | Chair | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eve Davies | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Platt | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Maxwell | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Margaret Hankin | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY ARMER | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tara Melissa Walker-Rose | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth MAY | Trustee | 08 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.