MILLSTREAM DAY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide interaction, meals and an exercise class for customers in and around Benson, Ewelme, Berrick Salome, Roke and Preston Crowmarsh. Activities are usually located in the Millstream Day Centre, open 3 days a week and staffed by a manager and cook employed by the charity and assisted by volunteers. In response to the Covid 19 pandemic we developed and still provide a meals at home service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,929 from 5 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 28 February 1983: Standard registration
- BENSON MILLSTREAM CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Paul Lanigan | Chair | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Merryweather | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy White | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Marie Hayes | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Massingham | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Broscomb | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Penelope Clayton | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.02k | £69.83k | £92.94k | £158.37k | £88.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.92k | £43.17k | £61.33k | £212.32k | £70.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.60k | £39.18k | £15.97k | £47.50k | £23.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO ELDERLY AND DISABLED PEOPLE AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE LIVING IN AND AROUND BENSON, EWELME, BERRICK SALOME, ROKE AND PRESTON CROWMARSH BY PROVIDING DAY CARE SERVICES AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Linked charities
- 28 February 1983 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill Stream Day Centre
Mill Stream
Benson
Wallingford
OX10 6RL
- Phone:
- 01491 834889
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window