Financial history AFRICAN VILLAGE SUPPORT

Charity number: 1164318
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £53.38k £53.38k £23.17k £30.85k £24.31k
Total expenditure £53.77k £53.77k £23.37k £27.63k £30.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A