AFRICAN VILLAGE SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to help improve the quality of life of both adults and children in rural Uganda. Working as a humanitarian, community based organisation, we have delivered a number of sustainable community projects including building a school hostel for girls, a large community centre and supporting women's groups and educating students through sponsors, along with livelihood projects for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Uganda
Governance
- 09 November 2015: CIO registration
- 12 January 2016: Funds received from 1106860 AFRICAN VILLAGE SUPPORT
- AVS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN ANDREW CATES | Chair | 01 November 2003 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Paul Steele | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Green | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Suzannah Mary Fullagar | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amina West | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NAOMI ELIZABETH WATASA LUMUTENGA | Trustee | 01 November 2003 |
|
|
||||
DAVID STEPHEN CATES | Trustee | 01 November 2003 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA LEWIS | Trustee | 01 November 2003 |
|
|||||
Marie Cates | Trustee | 01 November 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.38k | £53.38k | £23.17k | £30.85k | £24.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.77k | £53.77k | £23.37k | £27.63k | £30.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 April 2025 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 April 2025 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BULAMBULI COUNTY AND PAJWENDA DISTRICT IN RURAL EASTERN UGANDA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO:- RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ADVANCE EDUCATION PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AVS c/o Curzon Green Solicitors
114 Oxford Road
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP11 2DN
- Phone:
- 07546124450
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window