THE VALE ROYAL TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide weekly digital recordings of local news to all registered blind and partially sighted people in the Vale Royal district.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 21 April 1977: Standard registration
- V R T N (Working name)
- Vale Royal Talking Newspaper (Working name)
- VALE ROYAL TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- VALE ROYAL DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER (Previous name)
- VALE ROYAL DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Richard Swainson | Chair | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Rogers | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Wade | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN BATEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180 | £1.31k | £370 | £1.47k | £145 | |
|
Total expenditure | £537 | £1.08k | £1.83k | £1.52k | £2.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTIUTION ADOPTED 28 MARCH 1977 AS AMENDED 25 JUNE 1985 AND 14 MARCH 1995. AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 2016 as amended on 10 Mar 2020 as amended on 17 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPABILITY (OR DISABILITY)WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN WITH RECORDED ELECTRONIC MATERIAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cheshire Museums
162 London Road
NORTHWICH
Cheshire
CW9 8AB
- Phone:
- 07972754865
- Email:
- vrtalkingnews@gmail.com
- Website:
-
VR-talkingnews.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window