Financial history ST ANTONY'S CENTRE FOR CHURCH & INDUSTRY

Charity number: 1164837
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £475.42k £446.08k £398.22k £246.25k £311.61k
Total expenditure £432.72k £438.48k £468.63k £472.72k £334.84k
Income from government contracts £414.49k £82.04k N/A £0 £32.06k
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k N/A N/A £2.00k