CALLOW END VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hire of Village Hall for local activities, ie Community Coffee Shop, WI, local societies, Exercise Classes and parties. Maintaining building and grounds to required standards
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 25 April 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN JENNIFER CASSIDY | Chair | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Amber Fraser | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jonathan Fitzgerald Cassidy | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard Pugh | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN CHARLES | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ANNE DURNALL | Trustee | 24 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.23k | £14.79k | £25.02k | £25.53k | £11.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.48k | £7.95k | £9.67k | £37.99k | £10.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.50k | £18.53k | £3.47k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 2 MAY 1924
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
CALLOW END
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIMSTONE
BEAUCHAMP COURT BARNS
BEAUCHAMP LANE
CALLOW END
WORCESTER
WR2 4UQ
- Phone:
- 01905831019
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window