MIRACLE CENTRE (HOUSE OF GRACE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Among manyactivities, the church is engaged in the following comunity-based activities:- 1. Regular visits to Women Refuge 2. Involved in Macmillan Cancer UK Fundraising activities. 3. Yearly Men/Women/Children Day celebration activities. 4. Movie Night - open to the general public 5. Bi-Year Revival 6. Various Summer activities including Kids outing, Church Summer Outing etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Swindon
Governance
- 01 September 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KOFI KUMI- ADDO | Chair | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev GEORGE MIREKU-YEBOAH | Trustee | 10 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
YIADOM BOACHIE | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.00k | £59.86k | £63.04k | £82.52k | £75.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.63k | £54.44k | £43.81k | £61.49k | £60.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 03 December 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 03 December 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 08 December 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 08 December 2023 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 BARNWOOD ROAD
GLOUCESTER
GL2 0RX
- Phone:
- 07944852005
- Email:
- info@houseofgraceswindon.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window