Financial history UK New Artists

Charity number: 1164826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £248.50k £248.50k £262.36k £197.16k £190.72k
Total expenditure £203.86k £203.86k £269.49k £222.52k £174.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A