UK New Artists

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UK New Artists champions the next generation of creativity, supporting collaboration and intercultural dialogue, ensuring a vibrant and diverse creative future for the UK. We develop artists' practice through cross art form opportunities and celebrate creativity at national & international festivals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 December 2015: Standard registration
- UKYA (Working name)
- UK YOUNG ARTISTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor David McGravie | Chair | 04 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Ivy Lam | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Nana Amma Akrofi | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Hickford | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Knox | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Madiyiko | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hongwei Bao | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Baynton | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
prof Norman Cherry | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.50k | £248.50k | £262.36k | £197.16k | £190.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.86k | £203.86k | £269.49k | £222.52k | £174.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 FEB 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 FEB 2017 as amended on 18 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ARTISTIC PRACTICES [SUCH AS THEATRE, PHOTOGRAPHY AND MUSIC] FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A RANGE OF PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT ACTIVITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BASED IN THE UK [SEEKING TO DEVELOP ARTISTIC CAREERS]. 2.TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ARTISTS TO PERFORM AND EXHIBIT FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC. 3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF ARTS ENGAGEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH FREE ACCESS TO ARTISTIC PERFORMANCES IN THE EAST MIDLANDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROOM 121 TRENT HOUSE
NOTTINGHAM TRENT UNIVERSITY
50 SHAKESPEARE STREET
Nottingham
Nottinghamshire
NG1 4FQ
- Phone:
- 0115 848 4773
- Email:
- info@uknewartists.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window