SIKH LEARNING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity assists in running classes in: Punjabi/Gurmukhi; Reading of Sikh scriptures; Sikh history and Kirtan. The charity funds the holding of religious services and prayer meetings, production of Sikh literature and holding workshops and courses to teach people about the Sikh way of life. The charity supports the production of pieces of Sikh art, digital productions, audio and videos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- India
- United States
Governance
- 02 December 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JATINDER SINGH | Chair | 28 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kulwant Singh | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAJVINDER KAUR | Trustee | 28 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.91k | £40.15k | £40.52k | £60.71k | £75.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.59k | £36.33k | £38.68k | £56.27k | £69.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PREVENTION OF RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UK OR ABROAD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FREE FOOD DISTRIBUTION. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE UK OR ABROAD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CLASSES AND WORKSHOPS IN THE FOLLOWING SUBJECTS: • PUNJABI/GURMUKHI • READING OF SIKH SCRIPTURES • TRANSLATION OF SIKH SCRIPTURES • SIKH HISTORY • KIRTAN (SIKH CLASSICAL MUSIC) 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION IN THE UK OR ABROAD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE HOLDING OF RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND PRAYER MEETINGS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE SIKH RELIGION, AND HOLDING WORKSHOPS AND COURSES TO TEACH PEOPLE ABOUT THE SIKH RELIGION AND THE SIKH WAY OF LIFE. 4. THE PROMOTION OF SIKH ARTS AND CULTURE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 MERE VIEW
WALSALL
WS4 1XF
- Phone:
- 01922690325
- Email:
- jatinder.walsall@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window