MEMORY LANE-EASTBOURNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide social activities for people with dementia and their carers. Operating in Eastbourne and the surrounding areas. At present including singing, games, cinema, coffee morning, indoor bowls, digital friends and an allotment group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 14 September 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Madeleine Claire Furminger | Chair | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Saunders | Trustee | 06 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jumbo | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bax-Jaeger | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.84k | £37.84k | £18.13k | £29.73k | £15.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.97k | £27.78k | £33.53k | £28.39k | £16.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Sep 2015 as amended on 01 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA (AND OTHER ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS) AND THEIR CARERS IN EASTBOURNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
109 Madeira Way
EASTBOURNE
East Sussex
BN23 5UN
- Phone:
- 07393834498
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window