CLINICAL VIROLOGY NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the network is to promote the interests of clinical virology, and its medical and laboratory practise in the United Kingdom and Ireland. The Network provides evidence -based and practical virological advice to Government , Chief Medical Officers, the National Health Service and Public Health England on all aspects of viral diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bristol City
- City Of London
- City Of Swansea
- Manchester City
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 20 January 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sowsan Atabani | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM IRVING | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK ZUCKERMAN | Trustee | 03 February 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.36k | £38.13k | £42.45k | £71.10k | £62.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.34k | £16.94k | £35.11k | £31.03k | £49.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2024
(These accounts |
18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2023
(These accounts |
18 March 2025 | 352 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 June 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 21 June 2022 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 FEB 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/01/2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF VIROLOGY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1.PROMOTING CLINICAL VIROLOGY AND ITS MEDICAL AND LABORATORY PRACTICE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND NORTHERN IRELAND; 2.PROMOTING HIGH STANDARDS IN LABORATORY VIRAL DIAGNOSIS THROUGH QUALITY ASSESSMENT ACTIVITIES AND EDUCATION ; 3.IMPROVING AND SHARING THE KNOWLEDGE OF VIRUSES, PARTICULARLY AS IT RELATES TO THE DIAGNOSIS AND MANAGEMENT OF VIRAL DISEASES, THEIR PATHOGENESIS, NATURAL HISTORY AND PREVENTION; 4.IMPROVING AND SHARING DIAGNOSTIC METHODS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGS COLLEGE HOSPITAL
DENMARK HILL
LONDON
SE5 9RS
- Phone:
- 02032996296
- Email:
- maggie.hopper@nhs.net
- Website:
-
clinicalvirology.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window