Governing document COLLEGE OF PARAMEDICS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 MAR 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2015 AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 JUN 2019 as amended on 04 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COLLEGE IS ESTABLISHED (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING OF LIVES AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EFFICIENCY WITHIN THE PARAMEDIC PROFESSION INCLUDING BY: (1) DEVELOPING THE SCOPE AND PRACTICE OF PARAMEDIC SCIENCE AND RELATED SUBJECTS IN THE PARAMEDIC PROFESSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND PRACTITIONERS; (2) MANAGING A CONTINUING PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT PROCESS FOR THE PROFESSION; (3) PROMOTING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PARAMEDIC SCIENCES AND RELATED AREAS WITHIN THE PROFESSION; AND (4) ENCOURAGING AND SHARING GOOD CLINICAL PRACTICE AND HIGH STANDARDS OF CARE THROUGH RESEARCH AND LEADERSHIP.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.