Financial history CAIRNS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1162089
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £216.19k £219.35k £184.74k £185.20k £59.98k
Total expenditure £197.34k £212.86k £204.10k £168.21k £836.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £14.11k N/A N/A