YORK LGBT FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate in York and its surrounding environs. Currently we have the following subgroups: Health and Wellbeing, Hate Crime, Bisexual, Older People, Education and Young People and Trans. These groups aims to forward the charitable objects of the York LGBT Forum via, support groups, training and fostering a sentiment of equality in York.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joe McKenzie | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kristian Barnfield-Guest | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Bailey-Munt | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annis Catherine Elise Cordy | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jake Furby | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Holdsworth | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.47k | £103.20k | £45.82k | £25.91k | £20.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.85k | £80.71k | £78.87k | £23.16k | £23.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.82k | £2.00k | £2.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 16 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: - THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION IN RELATION TO LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANS, INTERSEX, QUEER, QUESTIONING (LGBT) AND ALLIES AND ASSOCIATES LIVING WITHIN THE CITY OF YORK AND ITS ENVIRONS; - CHALLENGING HOMOPHOBIA, BIPHOBIA, TRANSPHOBIA, OR ANY ASSOCIATED NEGATIVE ATTITUDES AND BEHAVIOUR WITHIN SOCIETY; - WORKING WITH PARTNERS AND ORGANISATIONS, PUBLIC AND PRIVATE, IN DEVELOPING INITIATIVES THAT WILL ENHANCE AND SAFEGUARD LGBT PEOPLE'S LIVES, ENSURING THEIR INCLUSION IN ALL ASPECTS OF LIFE, AND THAT THEIR HUMAN RIGHTS ARE PROTECTED; AND BY - ADVANCING EDUCATION, RAISING AWARENESS AND PROMOTING A CULTURE BASED ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANS, INTERSEX, QUEER, QUESTIONING PEOPLE (LGBT) AND ALLIES AND ASSOCIATES FROM BEING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY; AND 3. TO FURTHER ANY OTHER PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
York LGBT Forum
York CVS
15 Priory Street
York
YO1 6ET
- Phone:
- 07935200575
- Email:
- yorklgbtforum@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window