Financial history ORWELL PANTHERS ATHLETICS CLUB

Charity number: 1163145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £7.06k £6.95k £10.28k £7.26k £10.95k
Total expenditure £6.08k £5.06k £2.51k £7.26k £3.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A