Financial history I HAVE A GIFT

Charity number: 1162420
Charity reporting is up to date (99 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/09/2019 18/09/2020 18/09/2021 18/09/2022 18/09/2023
Total gross income £1 £752 £40 £23.27k £25.26k
Total expenditure £82 £626 £73 £11.31k £36.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £12.90k £25.20k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.88k N/A