THE WILBUR AND NISO SMITH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AS PER CIO DOCUMENT ; PRIMARILY EDUCATION, THE PROMOTION OF LITERACY AND READING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
59 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 May 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Richard Alexander Sullivan | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Sorby | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Davey | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MOKHINISO RAKHIMOVA-SMITH | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.64k | £58.14k | £146.51k | £73.36k | £159.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.57k | £70.12k | £89.22k | £126.01k | £158.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 May 2015
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND CULTURE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ART OF LITERATURE, AND TO EXTEND AND INCREASE APPRECIATION, KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE SAME; 2 TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO EDUCATION RELATING TO OR ASSOCIATED WITH THE ART OF LITERATURE; 3 TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT; AND (SAVE FOR PURPOSES INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY TO THOSE OBJECTS), NO OTHER PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WILBUR & NISO SMITH FOUNDATION
Unit 9
5-7 Wells Terrace
LONDON
N4 3JU
- Phone:
- 02074294100
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window