NEW TAVISTOCK YOUTH CAFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support young people aged between 11 and 19 in Tavistock and surrounding area. We provide advice, guidance, information, fun, and a range of experiences through generic youth work, drop in sessions, music projects, life skills, from Summer programmes to individual advice, signposting and support. The Youth Cafe is an organisation that is driven by Young People, for Young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £57,061 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 29 October 2015: CIO registration
- TYC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Wroath | Chair | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Colin Alexander MacKenzie | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Peter Rodgers | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Neil Edward Harper | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HARRY E O WALKER | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
MANDY VICTORIA LOUISE EWINGS | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
CATH GRISTY | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEVE GRUMMITT | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr JON ORD PhD BAhons | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.48k | £72.63k | £136.72k | £140.65k | £156.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.17k | £58.35k | £96.19k | £127.09k | £146.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £38.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.30k | £23.21k | £24.97k | £58.28k | £57.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 11 AND 19 LIVING IN WEST DEVON BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tavistock Youth Cafe
Unit 6 Pixon Court
Crelake Industrial Estate
Pixon Lane
TAVISTOCK
PL19 9AZ
- Phone:
- 07971811834
- Email:
- tavistockyouthcafe@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window