BRAITHWAITE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a venue for community, sport and recreation activities including football, cricket, tennis, bowls, croquet and camping on the recreation grounds and dance, aerobic classes, amateur dramatics and art classes in the hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 05 June 2015: CIO registration
- 06 January 2016: Funds received from 520375 THORNTHWAITE-CUM-BRAITHWAITE VICTORY MEMORIAL
No other names
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elvira Katrina O'Donovan | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Walter | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW THOBURN | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CAIN | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY WOODYER | Trustee | 10 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PEPPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.45k | £34.27k | £34.95k | £44.65k | £82.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.17k | £12.25k | £56.07k | £31.61k | £78.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.92k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THORNTHWAITE AND BRAITHWAITE AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT IN THE PARISH OF ABOVE DERWENT (?AREA OF BENEFIT?) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Braithwaite Institute
Braithwaite
KESWICK
Cumbria
CA12 5RY
- Phone:
- 07775566005
- Email:
- peterwalter@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
braithwaiteinstitute.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window