Accounts and annual returns THE PATRICK LEIGH FERMOR SOCIETY

Charity number: 1162244
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 March 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 May 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 25 August 2016 On Time