ANJUMAN-E-HUSAINIYAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ISLAMIC RELGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 16 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tasawar Hussain | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD HASSNAIN MALIK | Trustee | 19 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED RAFIQUE BOHJANI | Trustee | 20 October 1985 |
|
|
||||
SAJJAD HUSSAIN SHAH | Trustee | 20 October 1985 |
|
|
||||
Dr SYED BIZAAT IMAM ABIDI | Trustee | 20 December 1980 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.54k | £8.23k | £20.74k | £22.43k | £165.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.00k | £6.98k | £8.11k | £12.68k | £155.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON 16 JUN 2015 AMENDED ON 01 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE SHIA ITHNA ASHERI RELIGION IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND SURROUNDING AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON SHIA ITHNA ASHERI RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE SHIA ITHNA ASHERI RELIGION.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Fatfield Park
Washington
NE38 8BP
- Phone:
- 01914153621
- Email:
- MOHAMMAD.MALIK1@OUTLOOK.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window